+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sent To The Governor
On June 26, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On June 25, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Criminal Justice
On May 21, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee Criminal Justice
On April 30, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
On April 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Judiciary
- Passed
On January 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Judiciary
On January 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Fiscal Notes (8)
+ − Votes (4)
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 1
June 25, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
April 24, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
March 1, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (71)
Type:
Primary Sponsor