+ − Effective Date
- September 21, 2021
+ − Full Texts (18)
+ − Actions (10)
On September 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective 9-21-2021
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed By The Governor
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent To The Governor
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Transportation and Public Safety
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to committee Transportation and Public Safety
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported Health
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Health
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (88)
Type:
Primary Sponsor