+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (11)
On December 13, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
- Informally passed
- Reported - Substitute
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Motion to reconsider
- Passed
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported - Amended
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor