+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date: December 19, 2013
- Governor's action
On December 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On December 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurrence
On December 4, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd consideration
- Committee report
On October 31, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: State and Local Government
- Received in House
On October 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On October 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report
On October 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: State Government Oversight & Reform
- Introduced
+ − Votes (4)
December 4, 2013: Emergency clause stood
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
December 4, 2013: Passed as emergency measure
- Yeas: 93
October 30, 2013: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 31
October 30, 2013: Third Consideration - Emergency Clause
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor