+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On September 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Effective date: September 28, 2012
On June 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Governor's action
On June 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On June 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Concurrence
On May 24, 2012 in the House:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- Committee report: Substituted
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary & Ethics
- Received in House
On January 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On December 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Substituted
On July 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Insurance, Commerce, & Labor
- Introduced
+ − Votes (3)
June 12, 2012: House Amendments
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
May 24, 2012: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 91
January 10, 2012: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 31