+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On December 9, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee Transportation
On December 5, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
On December 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- Passed
On November 20, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Transportation
On November 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Transportation
On October 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Votes (6)
December 4, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 28
November 20, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
February 15, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
November 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
May 10, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 7
April 19, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (60)
Type:
Primary Sponsor