+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (2)
On October 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Transportation
On October 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Analysis
+ − Fiscal Note
+ − Votes (6)
June 26, 2024: Adopted
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 1
November 29, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 63
November 15, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
June 21, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 28
June 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
January 24, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor