+ − Effective Date
- March 23, 2022
+ − Full Texts (19)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective 3-23-2022
On December 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed By The Governor
- Sent To The Governor
On December 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred in House amendments
On December 8, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
On November 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Transportation and Public Safety
On September 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to committee Transportation and Public Safety
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported Transportation
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Transportation
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor