+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date: July 10, 2014
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor's action
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurrence
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report
On December 10, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Transportation, Public Safety and Homeland Security
- Received in House
On December 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On November 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Amended
On July 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Introduced
+ − Votes (3)
March 19, 2014: Bill Passed (Vote)
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 7
March 19, 2014: Bill Passed (Vote)
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 7
December 4, 2013: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 33
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor