+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 11, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Amended Insurance
- Passed
On November 12, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee Insurance
On July 2, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
On June 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute Insurance
- Passed
On September 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Insurance
On September 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (3)
December 11, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
June 26, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
May 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (91)
Type:
Primary Sponsor