+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (2)
On September 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Workforce and Higher Education
On August 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Analysis
+ − Fiscal Note
+ − Votes (3)
October 11, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
June 21, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
January 3, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 14
+ − Sponsors (60)
Type:
Primary Sponsor