+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On October 1, 2015 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On June 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor