+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date: September 19, 2014
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor's action
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurrence
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 3rd consideration: Amended
- Committee report: Substituted
On November 20, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Received in House
On November 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On November 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Substituted
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Criminal Justice
- Introduced
+ − Votes (3)
June 4, 2014: Bill Passed (Vote)
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 6
June 4, 2014: Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote)
- Yeas: 31
November 19, 2013: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor