+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (6)
On November 18, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Transportation
On June 11, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee Transportation
On May 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Transportation
- Passed
On September 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Transportation
On July 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (7)
November 18, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
June 12, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 92
May 22, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
May 8, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
December 13, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 8
November 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
June 6, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor