+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (2)
On September 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee General Government
On July 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Analysis
+ − Fiscal Note
+ − Votes (6)
June 21, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
June 20, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
June 7, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 17
May 24, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
March 29, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 31
March 28, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (86)
Type:
Primary Sponsor