+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 5, 2020 in the House:
- Refer to Committee Criminal Justice
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor