+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 21, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee Financial Institutions
On March 4, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute Veterans and Public Safety
- Passed
On September 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Veterans and Public Safety
On September 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Fiscal Notes (5)
+ − Votes (7)
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 2
June 25, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
June 12, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
October 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
June 7, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 31
May 31, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
March 29, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (70)
Type:
Primary Sponsor