+ − Effective Date
- May 17, 2021
+ − Full Texts (23)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective 5-17-2021
- Signed By The Governor
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent To The Governor
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred in House amendments
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
- Reported - Amended Finance
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Reported - Re-referred to Finance Rules and Reference
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Reported - Re-referred to Rules and Reference Economic and Workforce Development
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to committee Economic and Workforce Development
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported Finance
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Finance
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (93)
Type:
Primary Sponsor