+ − Full Texts (18)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective 1/1/21Certain provisions effective October 17, 2019
On June 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred in House amendments
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Passed - Amended
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Reported State and Local Government
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Refer to Committee State and Local Government
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported - Amended Government Oversight and Reform
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee Government Oversight and Reform
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (61)
Type:
Primary Sponsor