+ − Effective Date
- June 12, 2024
+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed By The Governor
On March 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sent To The Governor
On February 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- Concurred in House amendments
On February 7, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Amended Insurance
- Passed
On September 26, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Insurance
On September 18, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
On September 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute Insurance
- Passed
On April 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Insurance
On April 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Fiscal Notes (6)
+ − Votes (7)
February 28, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 32
February 7, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
October 11, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 30
October 10, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 4
September 13, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
June 27, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 95
June 20, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (106)
Type:
Primary Sponsor