+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (5)
On March 4, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported - Substitute Workforce and Higher Education
On April 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Workforce and Higher Education
On April 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
May 24, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
April 19, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
January 3, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor