+ − Effective Date
- March 23, 2022
+ − Full Texts (21)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective 3-23-2022
On December 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed By The Governor
- Sent To The Governor
On December 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred in House amendments
On December 8, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
- Reported - Substitute Commerce and Labor
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to committee Commerce and Labor
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported Agriculture and Natural Resources
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Agriculture and Natural Resources
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor