+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (5)
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to committee Public Utilities
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute Energy and Public Utilities
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Energy and Public Utilities
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor