+ − Effective Date
- March 15, 2023
+ − Full Texts (18)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Emergency Act
- Signed By The Governor
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sent To The Governor
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Passed
- Reported Ways and Means
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Ways and Means
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported - Substitute Ways and Means
On January 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Ways and Means
On January 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Votes (6)
May 24, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 87
April 26, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 15
March 29, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 31
March 28, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
March 1, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 15
February 8, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (88)
Type:
Primary Sponsor