+ − Full Texts (28)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to
On December 17, 2020 in the House:
- Report agreed to as emergency measure Conference Committee on S.B. 10
On September 21, 2020 in the House:
- Conference managers: Reps. - Lang, Seitz, Leland Conference Committee on S.B. 10
On September 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference managers: Sens. - Coley, Wilson, Craig
On September 16, 2020 in the House:
- Insist on amendments; asks for committee of conference
On September 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Refused to concur in House amendments
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Passed - Amended
On May 19, 2020 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Criminal Justice
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred Criminal Justice
- Re-referred Rules and Reference
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Criminal Justice
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Refer to Committee Criminal Justice
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported - Amended Government Oversight and Reform
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee Government Oversight and Reform
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor