+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Action
On January 3, 2023 in the House:
- Adopted
+ − Analysis
+ − Fiscal Note
+ − Votes (8)
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
June 17, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
April 10, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 5
December 6, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 16
November 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 2
June 14, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 29
May 24, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
January 3, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (99)
Type:
Primary Sponsor