+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Action
On April 16, 2024 in the House:
- Adopted
+ − Analysis
+ − Fiscal Note
+ − Votes (8)
May 8, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 89
April 24, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
April 23, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
April 10, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
December 6, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 89
November 29, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 1
October 18, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
March 1, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (114)
Type:
Primary Sponsor