+ − Effective Date
- April 24, 2024
+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Action
On December 6, 2023 in the House:
- Adopted
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Fiscal Notes (6)
+ − Votes (32)
June 26, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
February 28, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
January 10, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 92
December 13, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 91
December 6, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 89
December 6, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 30
November 29, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
November 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
October 11, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
October 11, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
October 10, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 4
June 30, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 95
June 28, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
June 27, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 94
June 21, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
June 20, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
June 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 4
May 24, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
May 10, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 30
May 9, 2023: Re-referred
- Yeas: 12
April 19, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 33
March 23, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 1
March 22, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
March 16, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
March 8, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 4
March 1, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
January 3, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 31
June 1, 2022: Passed
- Yeas: 32
June 1, 2022: Passed
- Yeas: 92
May 25, 2022: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
March 16, 2022: Passed
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
March 15, 2022: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (138)
Type:
Primary Sponsor