+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Action
On December 12, 2023 in the House:
- Adopted Rules and Reference
+ − Analysis
+ − Fiscal Note
+ − Votes (5)
November 15, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
June 14, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 27
May 24, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
May 22, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
May 9, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (127)
Type:
Primary Sponsor