+ − Effective Date
- January 11, 2024
+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Action
On November 15, 2023 in the House:
- Adopted
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Fiscal Notes (5)
+ − Votes (41)
June 27, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 31
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 21
June 20, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
April 24, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
February 7, 2024: Adopted
- Yeas: 93
January 10, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 9
December 13, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
December 13, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 8
December 6, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 88
December 6, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
November 29, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 6
November 15, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 94
November 15, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 30
November 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
November 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
October 18, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
October 11, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 30
October 11, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 83
October 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
September 26, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
June 28, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 32
June 21, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
June 21, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
June 20, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
June 14, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 9
June 13, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
May 24, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 8
May 22, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
May 16, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
May 10, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
May 9, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
April 26, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 32
April 26, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
April 19, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
March 29, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
March 23, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 1
March 22, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
March 16, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
March 8, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 7
March 1, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (135)
Type:
Primary Sponsor