+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Action
On November 14, 2023 in the House:
- Adopted Rules and Reference
+ − Votes (4)
September 26, 2023: Re-referred
- Yeas: 8
June 28, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
June 14, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 28
May 9, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (106)
Type:
Primary Sponsor