+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Action
On July 17, 2023 in the House:
- Adopted
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Fiscal Notes (5)
+ − Votes (4)
December 13, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 92
November 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
June 21, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
February 22, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsors (105)
Type:
Primary Sponsor