+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Action
On July 17, 2023 in the House:
- Adopted
+ − Analysis
+ − Fiscal Note
+ − Votes (6)
December 6, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 85
June 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 17
June 13, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
May 22, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
April 26, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
March 1, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (111)
Type:
Primary Sponsor