+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Concurrence
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Local Government & Veteran Affairs
- Received in Senate
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Military and Veterans Affairs
- Introduced
+ − Votes (2)
February 26, 2014: Resolution Adoption
- Yeas: 32
June 12, 2013: Resolution was adopted (Vote)
- Yeas: 95
+ − Sponsors (88)
Type:
Primary Sponsor