+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Action
On June 26, 2023 in the House:
- Adopted Rules and Reference
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 7, 2024: Adopted
- Yeas: 30
November 29, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 1
October 18, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
June 27, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (128)
Type:
Primary Sponsor