+ − Effective Date
- March 14, 2024
+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Action
On June 21, 2023 in the House:
- Adopted
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Votes (22)
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 2
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
June 12, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
April 24, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 1
April 8, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
November 15, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
October 11, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 31
October 3, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
September 20, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 3
June 21, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 4
June 21, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 30
June 15, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 7
June 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 6
June 14, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 27
June 7, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 31
May 31, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 4
May 24, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 5
May 10, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
March 29, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
February 22, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 7
February 21, 2023: Re-referred
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
February 16, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (135)
Type:
Primary Sponsor