+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 13, 2013 in the House:
- Concurrence
On November 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On October 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Insurance & Financial Institutions
- Received in Senate
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Health and Aging
- Introduced
+ − Votes (2)
November 13, 2013: Resolution Adoption
- Yeas: 32
June 5, 2013: Resolution was adopted (Vote)
- Yeas: 96
+ − Sponsors (66)
Type:
Primary Sponsor