+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (2)
On January 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Adopted
On January 3, 2023 in the House:
- Adopted
+ − Votes (12)
December 6, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 89
November 15, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
November 15, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
November 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 6
November 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 2
June 27, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 95
June 20, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
June 14, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 9
May 24, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 88
May 22, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
March 8, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 32
January 3, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (100)
Type:
Primary Sponsor