+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (5)
On December 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee General Government
On December 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Offered
On December 6, 2023 in the House:
- Adopted
On November 2, 2023 in the House:
- Reported State and Local Government
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Committee State and Local Government
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (5)
December 6, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 20
November 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 2
June 27, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 95
June 21, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 28
June 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (134)
Type:
Primary Sponsor