+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Government Oversight
- Adopted
On December 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Government Oversight
On December 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Offered
On December 6, 2023 in the House:
- Adopted
On May 22, 2023 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Pensions
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Committee Pensions
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (9)
April 10, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 4
December 6, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 85
June 14, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 29
May 24, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 89
May 22, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
May 10, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
April 26, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 7
April 25, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
April 19, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsors (135)
Type:
Primary Sponsor