+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (2)
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Commerce and Labor
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Votes (10)
December 13, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
December 13, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
November 15, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
November 15, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 23
October 4, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
October 3, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
October 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
June 28, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 32
June 6, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
May 24, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 87
+ − Sponsors (93)
Type:
Primary Sponsor