+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Effective 1/18/18
On October 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed
On September 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Reported
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (83)
Type:
Primary Sponsor