+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
On December 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported
On November 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor