+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (2)
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Criminal Justice
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analysis
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Votes (6)
January 18, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
December 6, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 30
November 15, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 94
May 9, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
March 8, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 7
March 1, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (99)
Type:
Primary Sponsor