+ − Full Texts (16)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference managers: Sens. - Huffman, M., Roegner, Fedor Conference Committee on H.B. 9
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference managers: Sens. - Roegner, Peterson, Fedor Conference Committee on H.B. 9
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference managers: Sens. - Roegner, Peterson, Maharath Conference Committee on H.B. 9
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference managers: Sens. - Huffman, M., Peterson, Fedor Conference Committee on H.B. 9
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Conference managers: Reps. - Jones, Edwards, Robinson Conference Committee on H.B. 9
- Refused to concur in Senate amendments
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Insist on amendments; asks for committee of conference
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed - Amended
- Reported - Substitute Higher Education
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee Higher Education
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Higher Education
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Refer to Committee Higher Education
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (56)
Type:
Primary Sponsor