+ − Effective Date
- September 30, 2021
+ − Full Texts (18)
+ − Actions (10)
On September 30, 2021 in the House:
- Effective 9-30-2021
On July 1, 2021 in the House:
- Signed By The Governor
On June 28, 2021 in the House:
- Sent To The Governor
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Health
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Health
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Health
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to committee Health
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (67)
Type:
Primary Sponsor