+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On December 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Health
On December 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 4, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On November 26, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Amended Public Health Policy
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Public Health Policy
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Votes (6)
December 4, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 87
November 26, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
April 10, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
October 30, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
June 27, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 95
June 21, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (117)
Type:
Primary Sponsor