+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (2)
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Primary and Secondary Education
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (4)
+ − Votes (6)
November 15, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 30
November 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 6
September 13, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
June 14, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 29
May 24, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
March 22, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (120)
Type:
Primary Sponsor