+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On September 28, 2018 in the House:
- Effective 9/28/18
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendments
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported - Amended
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommitted
On October 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Reported - Amended
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (56)
Type:
Primary Sponsor