+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On November 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Energy and Public Utilities
On July 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 26, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On June 21, 2023 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Public Utilities
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Public Utilities
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (12)
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 46
February 28, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
December 6, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 88
November 15, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 5
June 30, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 96
June 26, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
June 21, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 3
June 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
May 24, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 17
May 10, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 6
March 29, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 31
March 7, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (134)
Type:
Primary Sponsor